EP0826649 - Methods of making ferroelectric ceramic-polymer composites for voltage-variable dielectric tuning and structures using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 141 Spring Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, CA 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states HE HOLDINGS, INC. dba HUGHES ELECTRONICS 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, CA 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pierce, Brian M. 22501 Sheffield Drive Moreno Valley, CA 92557 / US | 02 /
Harris, Norman H. 22931 Eighth Street Newhall, CA 91321 / US | 03 /
Dougherty, Thomas K. 8515 Falmouth Avenue 421 Playa del Rey, California 90293 / US | 04 /
Chen, William W. 7816 Altavan Avenue Westchester, CA 90045 / US | 05 /
Lee, Florentino V. 6050 Canterbury Drive F-123 Culver City, CA 90230 / US | [1998/11] |
Former [1998/10] | 01 /
Pierce, Brian M. 22501 Sheffield Drive Moreno Valley, CA 92557 / US | ||
02 /
Harris, Norman H. 22931 Eighth Street Newhall, CA 91321 / US | |||
03 /
Dougherty, Thomas K. 7600 Manchester No. 1417 Playa del Rey, CA 90293 / US | |||
04 /
Chen, William W. 7816 Altavan Avenue Westchester, CA 90045 / US | |||
05 /
Lee, Florentino V. 6050 Canterbury Drive F-123 Culver City, CA 90230 / US | Representative(s) | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114332.6 | 20.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | US19960705508 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: US 705508 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826649 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826649 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/06, C04B41/83, H01Q1/00, H01Q1/38 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
C04B38/06 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q3/44 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00844 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/06, C04B18/02, C04B35/465, C04B41/4515, C04B41/48, C04B41/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/47] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von ferroelektrischen Keramik-Polymer-Verbundwerkstoffen für spannungsabhängiges dielektrisches Einregeln und Strukturen damit | [1998/10] | English: | Methods of making ferroelectric ceramic-polymer composites for voltage-variable dielectric tuning and structures using same | [1998/10] | French: | Procédés de fabrication de matériaux composites céramiques-polymères ferroélectriques pour réglage diélectrique à tension variable et structures les utilisant | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0667324 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [DY] 1-3 * page 2, lines 10-32; claims 1-3,5,6 * [A] 5,7,9; | [Y]GB396590 (HENRIK NIELSEN) [Y] 1-3 * whole document *; | [A]US3917773 (GATES JR LOUIS E, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [AP]US5557286 (VARADAN VIJAY K [US], et al) [AP] 1,5,7,9 * column 4, lines 10-27 *; | [A]WO8202707 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 9 *; | [A]US4682718 (WATANABE KUNIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH0733548 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 15, Database accession no. 95-110450, XP002050371 & JPH0733548 A 00000000 (TOHOKU CERAMIC KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |