EP0836960 - Convertible vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 D-49084 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunsmann, Winfried Stiegteweg 5 49143 Bissendorf / DE | 02 /
Thünemann, Bernhard Heinrichstrasse 22 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114353.2 | 20.08.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | DE19962017882U | 15.10.1996 Original published format: DE 29617882 U | [1998/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836960 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836960 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/10 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
B60J7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cabriolet-Fahrzeug | [1998/17] | English: | Convertible vehicle | [1998/17] | French: | Véhicule convertible | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 31.10.2001 | SE | 31.01.2002 | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/27] | SE | 31.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2164299 (PANACHE PROD PTY LTD) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9315758U (KARMANN GMBH W [DE]) [A] 1-4 * ANSPRUCH 5;; figure 1 * |