EP0826814 - Process and apparatus for treatment of fibrous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strämke, Siegfried, Dr. Fichtenhain 6 D-52538 Selfkant / DE | [1998/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114629.5 | 23.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | DE1996134725 | 28.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19634725 | [1998/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826814 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0826814 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826814 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06M10/02, D06L1/00 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
D06L1/16 (EP,US);
D06B21/00 (EP,US);
D06M10/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1999/16] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Fasermaterial | [1998/10] | English: | Process and apparatus for treatment of fibrous material | [1998/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le traitement des matériaux fibreux | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 03.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.01.2004 | [2004/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0592979 (EC CHEM IND CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9-11 * examples 1,2 * [A] 3-8,12; | [A]DE4339427 (SANDO IRON WORKS CO [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 49 *; | [A]JPH0657660 ; | [A]JPH04108164 ; | [A]JPH04163380 ; | [A]DE3248730 (SANDO IRON WORKS CO [JP]) [A] 1,12 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 4 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 13, Database accession no. 94-107390, XP002067747 & JPH0657660 A 00000000 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 24, Database accession no. 92-195823, XP002067748 & JPH04108164 A 00000000 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 29, Database accession no. 92-239568, XP002067749 & JPH04163380 A 00000000 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |