EP0835800 - Stanchion-carrying trolley for vehicle structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edscha LKW-Schiebeverdecke GmbH Scharwächterstrasse 5 94491 Hengersberg / DE | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fliege, Dieter Adolf Westen-Strasse 7 42855 Remscheid / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Sparing, Rolf Klaus Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Sparing, Rolf Klaus, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Ing. Horst Bonnekamp Bankstrasse 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | ||
Former [1999/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/16] | Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114721.0 | 26.08.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996217631U | 10.10.1996 Original published format: DE 29617631 U | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835800 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835800 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/02, B61D39/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B61D39/002 (EP);
B62D33/0222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rungenlaufwagen für Fahrzeugaufbauten | [1998/16] | English: | Stanchion-carrying trolley for vehicle structures | [1998/16] | French: | Chariot pour supporter l'étançon de la structure d'un véhicule | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE9312295U (POMMIER & CIE [FR]) [X] 1 * figure -; claims 1,4 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 26 * * page 6, line 20 - line 9 * [A] 10 [Y] 2; | [Y]US3999630 (MCPHEE DONALD T) [Y] 2 * figures 3,5,7 * * column 6, line 13 - line 59 * * column 7, line 14 - line 50 *; | [XA]FR2494203 (LALOYEAU MARCEL [FR]) [X] 1 * figure - * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 18 * [A] 2; | [A]US4208970 (MATYAS TIBOR [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US2757759 (MCEWEN NORMAN S) [A] 3 * figure - * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 6 *; | [XP]DE29617631U (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * |