EP0829551 - Cast-iron alloy for heat resistant motor parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harzer Graugusswerke GmbH 37449 Zorge/Südharz / DE | [1998/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lipka, Helmut Rather Ring 119 42855 Remscheid / DE | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Dirk Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Bauer, Dirk BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1999/10] | Bauer, Dirk, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Kfm. Bauer & Bauer, Patentanwälte, Am Keilbusch 4 52080 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/12] | Bauer, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing. Am Keilbusch 4 52080 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114724.4 | 26.08.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | DE19961036808 | 11.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19636808 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829551 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829551 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22C37/04 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F01N13/16 (EP);
C22C37/10 (EP);
F01N13/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 10.12.1999 | Title | German: | Gusseisen-Legierung für thermisch hochbelastete Motorenteile | [1998/12] | English: | Cast-iron alloy for heat resistant motor parts | [1998/12] | French: | Alliage de fonte à graphite à haute résistance thermique | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4702886 (KENT RANDY K) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 14 - line 16; figure 2; examples 3-5; claim 1 * * column 2, line 57 - line 66 *; | [A]DE2654474 (TEVES THOMPSON GMBH); | [A]JPH07118790 ; | [A]JPS60177125 ; | [A]DE2428821 (GOETZEWERKE) | [Y] - R. ELLIOTT, Cast Iron Technology, LONDON, GB, BUTTERWORTHS, (1988), XP002100214 [Y] 1-3 * page 28 - page 30 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07118790 A 19950509 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860129), vol. 010, no. 023, Database accession no. (C - 325), & JP60177125 A 19850911 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [A] * abstract * |