EP0834836 - Circle drawing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hama, Kiyoko, NEC IC MICROCOMPUTER SYSTEMS, LTD. 403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114758.2 | 26.08.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | JP19960228734 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22873496 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834836 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834836 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/20 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP,US);
G06T11/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zeichnen von Kreisen | [1998/15] | English: | Circle drawing method | [1998/15] | French: | Méthode pour dessiner des cercles | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0452776 | [XA] - HSU S Y, CHOW L R, LIU H C, "a new approach for the generation of circles", COMPUT. GRAPH. FORUM, uk, (199306), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 105 - 109, XP002111585 [X] 1,6 * page 105, paragraph 1 * * page 108, paragraph 3 * [A] 2-5,7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1467-8659.1220105 | [A] - YAO C ET AL, "HYBRID SCAN-CONVERSION OF CIRCLES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (19951201), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 1077-2626, pages 311 - 318, XP000544201 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2945.485618 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920603), vol. 016, no. 241, Database accession no. (P - 1363), & JP04052776 A 19920220 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * |