EP0828134 - Protection from land mines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11 80997 München / DE | [2004/28] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG Kraus-Maffei Str. 11 80997 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayer, Robert Wintergasse 19 86316 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
Drick, Rudolf Am Schulesgarten 14 86316 Friedberg / DE | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, et al Dr. Wolf-D. Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115084.2 | 01.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | DE1996135946 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635946 | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828134 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828134 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828134 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F41H7/04, F41H5/04 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
F41H7/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/31] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Minenschutz | [1998/11] | English: | Protection from land mines | [1998/11] | French: | Protection contre les mines terrestres | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4404889 (MIGUEL ANTHONY S [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 2; figures 4-7 *; | [X]US3604374 (MATSON HAROLD E, et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 17; figures 3,3A *; | [XP]DE19605230 (KELLNER GERD DR ING [DE]) [XP] 1,2,4,6,8,10 * column 6, line 34 - line 51; figure 6 *; | [E]DE19632598 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [E] 1,2,5,8,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [E]DE19631715 (BUNDESREP DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [E] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 3 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]US4125053 (LASKER GEORGE) [A] 1-5,7,10 * column W *; | [A]EP0250972 (SHIELDING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5533781 (WILLIAMS CHARLES A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0237095 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [AD]DE4234369 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE3633349 (JUNG AKUSTIK GMBH [DE]) | Examination | - International Defence Equipment Catalogue 1988/89 [page 373], MöNCH PUBLISHING GROUP | by applicant | DE4234369 |