EP0831283 - Expansion valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikoki Corporation 7-17-24 Todoroki, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Fujikoki Corporation 7-17-24 Todoroki, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuto, c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Minowa, Masakatsu, c/o Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115098.2 | 01.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | JP19960246513 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24651396 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0831283 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831283 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, G05D23/12 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B23K11/14 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/31 (KR);
B23K11/002 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/335 (EP,US);
F25B2341/0683 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Expansionsventil | [1998/13] | English: | Expansion valve | [1998/13] | French: | Vanne de détente | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 26.09.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.06.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 05.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2152781 (WILE DANIEL D) [A] 1-3* page 2, column L, line 58 - column R, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US2472149 (DILLMAN EARNEST J) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US5303864 (HIROTA HISATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,1A,4 *; | [A]EP0691517 (TGK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 46; figure - *; | [A]EP0718569 (FUJI KOKI MFG [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 10; figure - * | by applicant | JPH08226567 |