EP0854605 - Method and system for discovering computer network information from a remote device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1998/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rangarajan, Govindarajan 472 Crescent Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Huo, Chaoying 1114 Hopkins Avenue , No. 8 Redwood City, California 94062 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115180.8 | 02.09.1997 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | US19960707318 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: US 707318 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854605 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854605 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H04L41/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/09] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung von Informationen über ein Computernetz von einem entfernten Gerät | [1998/30] | English: | Method and system for discovering computer network information from a remote device | [1998/30] | French: | Système et procédé pour découvrir des informations sur un réseau d'ordinateur à partir d'un appareil éloiginé | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/39] | Request for further processing for: | 30.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2006 | Decision despatched | 28.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2003 | 30.09.2008 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0455402 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 44 * * claims 1,2,7-10 *; | [A]US5303235 (CHAN DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * figures 3-7 * * claims 1,2,7 *; | [A]GB2285727 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [A] - OLIVEIRA J L ET AL, "A METHODOLOGY TO REPRESENT LOGICAL NETWORK TOPOLOGY INFORMATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOM, KISSIMMEE, FEB. 14 - 17, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940214), vol. 1, no. SYMP. 4, pages 196 - 206, XP000482269 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.1994.643283 |