EP0832640 - Oxidation dyeing composition for keratin fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinigke, Bernd, Dr. Diplom-Chemiker Dierath 57 b 51399 Burscheid / DE | 02 /
Rose, David, Dr. Diplom-Chemiker Am Eichelkamp 223 40723 Hilden / DE | 03 /
Akram, Mustafa, Dr. Diplom-Chemiker Zylberbergstrasse 14 22457 Hamburg / DE | [1998/14] | Application number, filing date | 97115328.3 | 04.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | DE19961037371 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19637371 | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832640 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832640 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832640 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/41, A61Q5/10, D06P1/32 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
A61K8/4953 (EP);
A61K8/411 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
D06P1/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Oxidationsfärbemittel zum Färben von Keratinfasern | [1998/14] | English: | Oxidation dyeing composition for keratin fibres | [1998/14] | French: | Composition de teinture d'oxydation des fibres kératiniques | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | IE | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/05] | DK | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IE | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | DK | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IE | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IE | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 30.04.2008 | |
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 30.04.2008 | |
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 10.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2260135 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph L * * page 15, line 7 - line 38 * * page 16 * * example - *; | [D]DE4132615 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]); | [A]DE4400757 (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 19 - line 20 * * page 2, line 32 *; | [PA]WO9710799 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PA] 1* page 3, paragraphs 2,4; claims 1,2,6,7 * |