EP0902294 - A voltage monitoring circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Haggertystrasse 1 85356 Freising / DE | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Laszlo Sudetenlandstrasse 12 85356 Freising / DE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/11] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115644.3 | 09.09.1997 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902294 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902294 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
G01R19/16538 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Spannungsüberwachung | [1999/11] | English: | A voltage monitoring circuit | [1999/11] | French: | Circuit de surveillance d'une tension | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/24] | NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0127139 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0678751 (MATRA MHS) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5617285 (ZITTA HEINZ) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - line 49 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5440254 (SUNDBY JAMES T) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1A *; | [A]JPH04125470 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 016, no. 386, Database accession no. (P - 1404), & JP04125470 A 19920424 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |