EP0831130 - Light fast disazodyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/13] | New light fast disazodyes | ||
[2000/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunde, Klaus, Dr. Moltkestrasse 5 53819 Neunkirchen / DE | [1998/13] | Application number, filing date | 97115692.2 | 10.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | DE1996138889 | 23.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19638889 | [1998/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0831130 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831130 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B31/08, C09B43/16, C09B43/132 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
C09B43/16 (EP,US);
C09B31/08 (EP,US);
C09B35/037 (EP,US);
C09B35/06 (EP,US);
C09B43/132 (EP,US);
D21H21/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtechte Disazofarbstoffe | [2000/49] | English: | Light fast disazodyes | [2000/49] | French: | Colorants disazoiques stables à la lumière | [2000/49] |
Former [1998/13] | Neue lichtechte Disazofarbstoffe | ||
Former [1998/13] | New light fast disazodyes | ||
Former [1998/13] | Nouveaux colorants disazoiques stables à la lumière | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.12.2000 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0514330 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DY] 1-7 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 8; examples 30,31,45,46; claim 1 * * page 7, line 34 - page 8, line 20 *; | [DY]EP0534903 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DY] 1-7 * examples 32,53,54 * * examples 90,91 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 36 * * page 9, line 33 - line 36 *; | [A]EP0623704 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,5-7 * page 2, line 1 - line 46 * * page 5, line 28 - line 30 * * page 6, line 3 - line 30 *; | [A]EP0622424 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 12, line 35 - line 42 * * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 13 * * example 5 * |