EP0830954 - Tyre having silica reinforced rubber tread with outer, carbon black reinforced rubber strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howald, John Alan 2645 Connecticut Court Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US | 02 /
Garber, Gary Bruce 728 Glendale Street SW North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 03 /
Nowacki, Marc Christopher 1239 Peachwood Way Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1998/13] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 97116060.1 | 16.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | US19960717739 | 23.09.1996 Original published format: US 717739 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830954 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830954 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/08 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B60C19/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0016 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR);
Y10S152/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reifen mit einer Kieselsäure verstärkten Gummilauffläche, und einem Russ-verstärkten äusseren Streifen | [1998/13] | English: | Tyre having silica reinforced rubber tread with outer, carbon black reinforced rubber strip | [1998/13] | French: | Bandage pneumatique muni d'une bande de roulement en caoutchouc renforcé par de la silice, et d'un ruban extérieur en caoutchouc renforcé par du noir de carbone | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.11.2002 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0747243 (SP REIFENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,4 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 8; figures 3,4; claim - *; | [A]EP0705722 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * claim - *; | [A]EP0732229 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]US2329332 (BULL ARTHUR W, et al) [DA] 1,2 * figure -; claim - * |