EP0825593 - Shock-resistant, electrostatically actuated pick-up for optical recording and playback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2355 Main Street Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gregg, David Paul 3650 Helms Avenue Culver City, California 90232-2417 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/09] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97116241.7 | 02.02.1994 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | US19930013773 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: US 13773 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825593 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825593 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, H02N1/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
H02N1/006 (EP,US);
G11B7/093 (EP,US);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US);
G11B7/0935 (EP,US);
G11B7/0937 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/09] | Title | German: | Schockstabiler und elektrostatisch gesteuerter Kopf zur optischen Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe | [1998/09] | English: | Shock-resistant, electrostatically actuated pick-up for optical recording and playback | [1998/09] | French: | Tête actionnée électrostatiquement et résistante aux chocs pour l'enregistrement et lecture optique | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94300766.6 / EP0613124 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57205834 ; | [A]JPH01119926 ; | [AP]JPH04340373 (NIPPON CERAMIC KK) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN * * vol. 17, no. 193 (E-1351) 15 April 1993 * * abstract * [PA] 1-7; | [A]JPH01238470 ; | [A]JPH04162229 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830312), vol. 7, no. 60, Database accession no. (P - 182)<1205> , & JP57205834 A 19821217 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K K) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890811), vol. 013, no. 361, Database accession no. (P - 917), & JP01119926 A 19890512 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891218), vol. 013, no. 571, Database accession no. (E - 862), & JP01238470 A 19890922 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920922), vol. 16, no. 457, Database accession no. (P - 1426), & JP04162229 A 19920605 (CANON INC) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |