EP0818693 - Optical waveguide device and manufacturing method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eda, Kazuo 2-20-26, Tezukayama Minami Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116279.7 | 07.07.1993 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | JP19920180857 | 08.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18085792 | JP19920233391 | 01.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23339192 | JP19930076618 | 02.04.1993 Original published format: JP 7661893 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818693 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
G02B6/125 (EP,US);
G02B6/13 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12097 (EP,US);
G02B2006/1215 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12159 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1998/03] | Title | German: | Optischer Wellenleiter und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [1998/03] | English: | Optical waveguide device and manufacturing method of the same | [1998/03] | French: | Guide d'onde optique et sa méthode de fabrication | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/13] | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93110893.0 / EP0585565 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2191603 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - R. TH. KERSTEN ET AL., "Multimode integrated optics using dielectric and hollow metallic waveguides", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS., AMSTERDAM NL, (19810101), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 25 - 30, XP002045734 [A] 1-16 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(81)90023-7 | [A] - R.G. HUNSPERGER, Integrated Optics: Theory and Technology, BERLIN, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1985), XP002045735 [A] 1-16 * paragraph 1.2.1:"Hybrid versus Monolithic Approach" * |