EP0860877 - Semiconductor device and method for producing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Akira c/o Oki Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116500.6 | 22.09.1997 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | JP19970040717 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4071797 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860877 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860877 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/31 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H01L23/31 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/49541 (EP,US);
H01L23/49551 (EP,US);
H05K3/3426 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1998/35] | H01L23/495 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/46] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [1998/35] | English: | Semiconductor device and method for producing thereof | [1998/35] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP05105068.0 / EP1577944 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH08316371 ; | [XY]US4920074 (SHIMIZU ICHIO [JP], et al) [X] 9 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 55; figures 5-11 * [Y] 1-4; | [YA]JPH04171856 ; | [YA]US5270492 (FUKUI MASARO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 9; | [YA]JPH0547954 ; | [YA]JPH05326807 ; | [XA]JPH06252310 ; | [X]JPH07211847 ; | [X]JPH0444347 ; | [X]JPH0697223 ; | [X]JPH03116940 ; | [E]JPH09275177 ; | [X]JPH04280663 ; | [XY]JPS62105456 ; | [Y]JPH06302758 ; | [A]JPH02280359 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08316371 A 19961129 (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 6-9 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921005), vol. 016, no. 478, Database accession no. (E - 1274), & JP04171856 A 19920619 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 6-9 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930629), vol. 017, no. 344, Database accession no. (E - 1390), & JP05047954 A 19930226 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 9 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940310), vol. 018, no. 144, Database accession no. (E - 1521), & JP05326807 A 19931210 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941207), vol. 018, no. 643, Database accession no. (E - 1640), & JP06252310 A 19940909 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 9 * the whole document * [A] 1-3 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07211847 A 19950811 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920527), vol. 016, no. 230, Database accession no. (E - 1208), & JP04044347 A 19920214 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940706), vol. 018, no. 359, Database accession no. (E - 1574), & JP06097223 A 19940408 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910812), vol. 015, no. 315, Database accession no. (E - 1099), & JP03116940 A 19910517 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 5 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09275177 A 19971021 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [E] 5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930219), vol. 017, no. 085, Database accession no. (E - 1322), & JP04280663 A 19921006 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 6,7 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871012), vol. 011, no. 312, Database accession no. (E - 548), & JP62105456 A 19870515 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 6-8 * abstract * [Y] 10 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06302758 A 19941028 (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910206), vol. 015, no. 050, Database accession no. (E - 1030), & JP02280359 A 19901116 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [A] 8,10 * the whole document * |