EP0834617 - Latex-saturated paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kronzer, Francis Joseph 1025 Avery Creek Drive Woodstock, GA 30188 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116512.1 | 22.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | US19960736349 | 03.10.1996 Original published format: US 736349 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834617 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834617 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/34, D21H27/16 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
D21H27/16 (EP,US);
D21H17/34 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
D21H17/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | D21H17/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/42] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durch Latex imprägniertes Papier | [1998/15] | English: | Latex-saturated paper | [1998/15] | French: | Papier imprégné de latex | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60215895 ; | [A]EP0582466 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 49, Database accession no. 1985-308147, XP002125615 & JPS60215895 A 19851029 (SUMITOMO NAUGATUCK KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |