EP0832572 - A device for adjusting and securing a helmet to the head of a user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camau System di Casale & C. s.n.c. Via Goito 34/B 10042 Nichelino (Turin) / IT | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casale, Maurizio Via Borgonuovo 50/M 10029 Villastellone (Turin) / IT | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent, Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97116513.9 | 23.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00798 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: IT TO960798 | [1998/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832572 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832572 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832572 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/08, A42B3/14 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
A42B3/085 (EP,US);
A42B3/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | A42B3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/15] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anpassung und Befestigung eines Helmes an den Kopf eines Benutzers | [2000/47] | English: | A device for adjusting and securing a helmet to the head of a user | [1998/14] | French: | Dispositif pour ajuster et fixer un casque sur la tête d'un utilisateur | [1998/14] |
Former [1998/14] | Vorrichtung zur Anpassung und Befestigung eines Helmes an den Kopf eines Benutzer | Examination procedure | 22.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 30.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.03.2002 | NL | 20.03.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/06] | BE | 20.03.2002 | |
NL | 20.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2846683 (DYE EDWARD R, et al); | [A]US4000520 (SVENDSEN NOEL A, et al) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 5, line 14 - line 59 * * figures 4-7 *; | [XA]US4279037 (MORGAN FRANK S) [X] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 36 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 2,5,6; | [A]US4888831 (OLESON RICHARD A [US]); | [A]EP0497032 (SHOEI KAKO KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 12 - line 18 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE4326049 (PDS VERSCHLUSTECHNIK AG [CH]) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 40 * * figures 10,11 *; | [A]DE29500809U (BRITAX NORDISKA BARN AB [SE]); | [PA]US5572749 (OGDEN ANDREW M [US]) [PA] 1,3,5-7 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 13 ** figures 3-8 * |