EP0834622 - Heat insulated connection between external concrete elements, particularly cantilever parts, and building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 D-76534 Baden-Baden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | 04 /
* * * | 05 /
* * * | 06 /
* * * | 07 /
* * * | 08 /
* * * | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner, Postfach 4026 76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116605.3 | 24.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | DE1996140652 | 02.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19640652 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834622 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834622 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834622 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/16, E04B1/00, E04B1/76 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
E04B1/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2001/29] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmegedämmtes Verbindungselement zwischen externen Betonteilen, insbesondere Kragplatten, und Gebäude | [1998/15] | English: | Heat insulated connection between external concrete elements, particularly cantilever parts, and building | [1998/15] | French: | Liaison isolée thermiquement entre éléments extérieurs en béton, en particulier en porte-à-faux, et bâtiment | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 26.04.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT | 16.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.09.2003 | GB | 03.09.2003 | BE | 30.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | SE | 03.12.2003 | [2004/52] |
Former [2004/45] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GB | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 03.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121685 (SCHOCK EBERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]DE3403240 (QUINTING FRIEDHELM) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AP]DE29615018U (ROJEK RICHARD PROF DR ING [DE], et al) [AP] 1-18 * page 3, line 10 - line 15; figures 2,3 * | Examination | FR1588887 |