EP0837505 - Semiconductor device and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abiko, Hitoshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Isami NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116811.7 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | JP19960254438 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25443896 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837505 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L29/08, H01L21/336 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
H01L21/76831 (EP,US);
H01L21/76 (KR);
H01L23/485 (EP,US);
H01L29/41766 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S148/05 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kontaktstruktur in Halbleiterbauelement und Methode zu deren Herstellungsverfahren | [1998/17] | English: | Semiconductor device and method of producing the same | [1998/17] | French: | Structure de contact d'un dispositif semiconducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 11.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4862232 (LEE HAN-SHENG [US]) [A] 1-5* figure 1 *; | [XA]US4963502 (TENG CLARENCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 8, line 4 - column 10, line 10; figure 7 * [A] 5; | [XA]US5132755 (UENO MASUHIDE [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 10L * [A] 3-5 |