EP0846495 - Ion exchange material based on polysaccharide and its preparation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSF-Forschungszentrum für Umwelt und Gesundheit GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1, Neuherberg 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [1998/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Bao Wen, Prof. Dr. Xueyuan Nanlu 76 Haidain District, 10081 Beijing / CN | 02 /
Kettrup, Antonius, Prof. Dr. Rumbecker Höhe 10 59821 Arnsberg / DE | 03 /
Fischer, Klaus, Dr. Hochstrasse 22 85221 Dachau / DE | 04 /
Bieniek, Dieter, Dr. Siriusstrasse 2 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [1998/24] | Application number, filing date | 97116829.9 | 27.09.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | DE1996150485 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19650485 | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846495 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846495 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846495 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/22, C08F251/00, C08F251/02 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
B01J39/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/24] | B01J39/22, C08F251/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/16] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ionenaustauschermaterial auf polysaccharidbasis und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1998/24] | English: | Ion exchange material based on polysaccharide and its preparation process | [1998/24] | French: | Echangeur d'ions à base de polysaccharide et son procédé de préparation | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3395070 (ADAMS JAMES W, et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 9, lines 51-53; example 7 * * column 2, line 43 *; | [A]DE2356532 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-6 * page 3 - page 4; example 1 *; | [A]US4584103 (LINDER CHARLES [IL], et al) [A] 4* column 2, lines 27-36; claim 1 *; | [Y] - FISCHER H J ET AL, "SYNTHESES OF CELLULOSE EXCHANGERS CARRYING CHELATING ANCHOR GROUPS FOR SELECTIVE SEPARATION OF URANYL IONS", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, (19930501), vol. 208, pages 133 - 150, XP000372857 [Y] 1-6 * page 133 * * page 143 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1993.052080113 |