EP0836077 - Device and method for testing position dependent signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2002/37] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzapfel, Wolfgang, Dr. Grottenweg 2 83119 Obing / DE | 02 /
Huber, Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Kreuzbergstrasse 17a 83365 Nussdorf / DE | 03 /
Bernard, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Futakerstrasse 22 84518 Garching/ALz / DE | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 97117011.3 | 01.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996142200 | 12.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19642200 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836077 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836077 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, G01D18/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
G01D18/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/2457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/24] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | ||
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kontrollvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Prüfung von positionsabhängigen Abtastsignalen | [1998/16] | English: | Device and method for testing position dependent signals | [1998/16] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour contrôler les signaux dépendants de la position | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0292151 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 13; figures 10-13 *; | [A]EP0555507 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document * |