EP0834679 - Vehicle transmission control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOMA ROLTRA S.p.A. Zona Industriale, Via Camerelle 86077 Pozzilli (IS) / IT | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states ROLTRA MORSE S.p.A. Zona Industriale, Via Camerelle 86077 Pozzilli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottino, Franco Giovanni Via Ippolito Nievo, 8 56017 San Giuliano Terme / IT | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97117147.5 | 02.10.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00810 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: IT TO960810 | [1998/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834679 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/02 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
F16H59/0208 (EP);
F16H61/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/52] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeuggetriebesteuervorrichtung | [1998/15] | English: | Vehicle transmission control device | [1998/15] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour transmission véhiculaire | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4221762 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3-5; | [X]EP0667470 (JSJ CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE2460769 (AUDI AG) [X] 1 * page 5, line 8 - line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3602060 (MAGG ALFRED) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * |