EP0837583 - System and method for distributing bulletins to external computers accessing wide area computer networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bräuner, Falk A. Leipziger Strasse 31 07545 Gera / DE | [2005/34] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Novaville AG Torellstrasse 1 10243 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Simmons, C. Thomas Thomasiusstrasse 23 10557 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Herbold, Christian Isländische Strasse 16 10439 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmons, Thomas C. Thomasiusstrasse 23 10557 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Herbold, Christian Florapromenade 14 13187 Berlin / DE | [1999/13] |
Former [1998/17] | 01 /
Simmons, Thomas C. Thomasiusstrasse 23 10557 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/19] | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/15] | Kruspig, Volkmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117169.9 | 02.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | US19960027677P | 07.10.1996 Original published format: US 27677 P | US19970866265 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 866265 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0837583 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0837583 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837583 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06Q30/02, H04L12/28 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04L63/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0277 (EP,US);
H04L12/2856 (EP,US);
H04L12/2896 (EP,US);
H04L63/04 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/17] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Berichtverteilung auf externe Rechner, die auf Grossraumnetze zugreifen | [1998/17] | English: | System and method for distributing bulletins to external computers accessing wide area computer networks | [1998/17] | French: | Système et méthode pour la distribution de bulletins à des calculateurs externes ayant accès à des réseaux étendus | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 08.10.2009 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2004 | 31.10.2007 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.05.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of applicant | [2010/02] | 01.03.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/02] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | GB | 02.10.2014 | IE | 02.10.2014 | LU | 02.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/46] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
IE | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
SE | 26.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KOHDA Y ET AL, "UBIQUITOUS ADVERTISING ON THE WWW: MERGING ADVERTISEMENT ON THE BROWSER", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19960501), vol. 28, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1493 - 1499, XP002037594 [A] 1,13,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(96)00070-0 |