EP0838239 - Flame attenuator for poke-through constructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Myronuk, Donald J., Dr. 1369 Bryan Avenue San Jose, CA 95118-1812 / US | For all designated states Hoffman, Jon F. 2445 Oro Dam Blvd. Ste., 7 Oroville, CA 95966 / US | [1998/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/18] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117249.9 | 06.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | US19960727162 | 07.10.1996 Original published format: US 727162 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838239 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838239 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838239 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/07 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A62C3/07 (EP,US);
A62C2/06 (EP,US);
Y10S428/921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2093 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/17] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flammendämpfer für Einschübe durch Konstruktionen | [2002/11] | English: | Flame attenuator for poke-through constructions | [1998/18] | French: | Atténuateur de flammes pour constructions à pousser à travers | [1998/18] |
Former [1998/18] | Flammendämpfer für Einschübe durch Bauwerke | Examination procedure | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 19.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | DE | 28.06.2002 | GB | 06.10.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
GB | 06.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | SE | 27.06.2002 | |
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
GB | 06.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 27.06.2002 | |
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1662310 (GEISTERT ALBERT G) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 34 - line 105; figure - *; | [A]US2223395 (BUREN CHARLES J VAN) [A] 1-6 * page 1, column R, line 8 - page 2, column R, line 2 *; | [A]JPS55159215 ; | [A]JPS55159216 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810307), vol. 005, no. 036, Database accession no. (P - 051), & JP55159215 A 19801211 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810307), vol. 005, no. 036, Database accession no. (P - 051), & JP55159216 A 19801211 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | US4455802 | US5402615 | US3678634 | US4467577 |