EP0837531 - Connector system with quick coupling/decoupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hyzin, Peter Joseph 27001 Brighton Lane Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Regional Patent Office Europe Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Regional Patent Office Europe Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | ||
Former [1998/32] | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Regional Patent Office - Europe c/o ITT Cannon GmbH Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | Esser, Wolfgang c/o Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH ITT Regional Patent Office-Europe Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117664.9 | 13.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | US19960733851 | 18.10.1996 Original published format: US 733851 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0837531 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0837531 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837531 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/625, H01R13/639 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
H01R13/639 (EP,US);
H01R13/625 (EP,US);
Y10S439/953 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/32] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steckverbindersystem mit Schnellkupplung, -entkupplung | [1998/17] | English: | Connector system with quick coupling/decoupling | [1998/17] | French: | Système de connecteur avec couplage/découplage rapide | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3159444 (STINE JR HOWARD E) [A] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 8 - line 32 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 37 *; | [A]US3551880 (HARTWELL RONALD GROFF) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 41 ** column 4, line 46 - line 60 *; | [A]FR2652454 (VALPUESTA GOMEZ CASILDA) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 8 *; | [XA]US5073127 (DALY JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 5,6,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, line 27 - line 51 * [A] 1; | [A]US5562458 (STORA MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 47 * * column 6, line 14 - line 43 * |