EP0837059 - Shaped cyanuric chloride bodies and a process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goedecke, Ralf, Dr. Ulmenstrasse 18 63417 Rodenbach / DE | 02 /
Hentschel, Klaus, Dr. Fuldaerstrasse 26 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 03 /
Möller, Rolf Ahornstrasse 7 64832 Rodenbach / DE | 04 /
Ehrhardt, Knut Remiesenweg 17 63454 Hahau / DE | 05 /
Schmidt, Manfred Dr. Langgasse 27 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 06 /
Kissner, Michael Dr. Rilkestrasse 25 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | [1998/31] |
Former [1998/17] | 01 /
Goedecke, Ralf, Dr. Ulmenstrasse 18 63417 Rodenbach / DE | ||
02 /
Hentschel, Klaus, Dr. Fuldaerstrasse 26 63517 Rodenbach / DE | |||
03 /
Möller, Rolf Ahornstrasse 7 64832 Rodenbach / DE | |||
04 /
Ehrhardt, Knut Remiesenweg 17 63454 Hahau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117666.4 | 13.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | DE1996142449 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19642449 | [1998/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837059 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/28 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
C07D251/28 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cyanurchlorid-Formlinge und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/17] | English: | Shaped cyanuric chloride bodies and a process for their preparation | [1998/17] | French: | Pièces moulées en cyanuric chloride et un procédé pour leur préparation | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 07.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/24] | 31.12.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3941784 (NELSON GEORGE D, et al) [X] 1-3 * table 1 *; | [XD]DE2843379 (DEGUSSA) [XD] 1-3 * page 4, line 8 - line 10; example 11 *; | [X]US3427314 (SIMS MARC J, et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XD]EP0416584 (LONZA AG [CH]) [XD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2239872 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology Third edition,volume 21, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, XP002054080 [A] 4-7 * page 77 - page 105 * |