EP0843453 - System and method for improved mail networking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton Florida 33487 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Siemens Business Communication Systems, Inc. 4900 Old Ironside Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaffer, Shmuel 1211 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA. 94301 / US | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/21] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Roke Manor Old Salisbury Lane Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97117722.5 | 14.10.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | US19960748866 | 13.11.1996 Original published format: US 748866 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843453 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843453 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M7/00, H04M3/54 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H04M3/53325 (EP,US);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/21] | H04M3/50, H04M7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/08] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für verbesserte Nachrichtennetzwerke | [1998/21] | English: | System and method for improved mail networking | [1998/21] | French: | Système et méthode pour réseaux de messagerie améliorés | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9614701 (APOGEE 2000 INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10,18 * page 2, line 29 - page 17, line 25; figures 3,4 * [Y] 3-5,7,8,11-17,19,20; | [Y]EP0634860 (ROLM CO [US]) [Y] 3-5,7,8,11-17,19,20 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 7, line 58 * * column 11, line 25 - column 22, line 48 *; | [A] - SHIVJI A M ET AL, "VOICE MAIL INTERNETWORKING USING X.400", MESSAGE HANDLING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATION LAYER COMMUNICATION PROTOCOLS, (19910101), XP000560986 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - VAUDREUIL G, "NETWORKED VOICE MESSAGING", CONNEXIONS,XX,XX, (19940101), vol. 8, no. 11, ISSN 0894-5926, pages 25 - 27, XP000560759 [A] * the whole document * |