EP0838354 - Tire changing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l. Via Balduina, 5/7 42010 Rio Saliceto (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l. Via Balduina, 5/7 I-42010 Rio Saliceto (Prov. of Reggio Emilia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzaga, Tullio Via Canolo, 41 42015 Correggio (Prov. of Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano, et al Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano, et al Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2002/27] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano, et al Reniero, Bergamini & Partners s.r.l., 21, Via A. Sciesa 37122 Verona / IT | ||
Former [1998/18] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97117752.2 | 14.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | IT1996VR00090 | 22.10.1996 Original published format: IT VR960090 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838354 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838354 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/132, B60B30/00 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
B60B30/06 (EP,US);
B60C25/132 (EP,US);
B60B2900/116 (EP,US);
B60B2900/212 (EP,US);
B60B2900/531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/02] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reifenwechselgerät | [1998/18] | English: | Tire changing machine | [1998/18] | French: | Machine à changer les pneumatiques | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0448042 (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - line 56; figure 4 *; | [A]US3958618 (REUTHER MAURICE A) [A] 1 * column 18, line 9 - column 19, line 52, paragraph -; figure A * | by applicant | US4335772 | IT218234 |