EP0837277 - Retainer for use in fluid couplings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikin Incorporated 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states FUJIKIN INCORPORATED 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohara, Tsutomu, c/o Fujikin Incorporated 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamaji, Muchio, c/o Fujikin Incorporated 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fichtestrasse 18 41464 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117803.3 | 15.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | JP19960272034 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27203496 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0837277 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0837277 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837277 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/02, F16L27/08, F16J15/06 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
F16L27/0832 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | F16L19/02, F16L27/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halter zum Gebrauch in Rohrverbindungen | [1998/17] | English: | Retainer for use in fluid couplings | [1998/17] | French: | Support pour usage dans des raccords | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1468824 (MILES MCINTYRE) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, line 103 - page 1, line 110; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4294477 (AHLSTONE ARTHUR G) [A] 1* column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 61; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP0567924 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 17; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0651195 (TADAHIRO OHMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 6 - column 4, line 27; figure 2 * |