EP0839557 - Connecting device for a shoe comprising straps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/19] | Connecting device of a shoe with straps | ||
[2001/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rigal, Jean-Pierre Mésigny La Véni 74330 La balme de sillingy / FR | 02 /
Chedal Anglay, Christophe 8, rue du Square 74960 Cran Gevrier / FR | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Lejeune, Benoît Salomon S.A.S D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Lejeune, Benoit Salomon S.A. D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97117997.3 | 17.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | FR19960013491 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9613491 | [1998/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839557 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839557 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/08, A43C11/14 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
A43C11/1493 (EP,US);
A63C10/06 (EP,US);
A63C10/04 (EP,US);
A63C10/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gurtverbindungsvorrichtung für einen Schuh | [2001/15] | English: | Connecting device for a shoe comprising straps | [2001/15] | French: | Dispositif de liaison par sangle d'une chaussure | [1998/19] |
Former [1998/19] | Gurtverbindungsvorrichtung von einem Schuh | ||
Former [1998/19] | Connecting device of a shoe with straps | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.01.2002 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4979760 (DERRAH STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, paragraph 2; figures 2-6 *; | [A]DE9113766U (TAKE OFF PROD. AG) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0770413 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) [PA] 1,2,4,5,8 * column 4; figures 2-8 *; | [PA]EP0787512 (FRITSCHI AG SWISS BINDINGS [CH]) [PA] 1* figures 1,5-7,10 * | by applicant | US5356170 |