EP0837323 - Method of and system for video surveillance of a fast moving web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED PAPERS, INC. 231 1st Avenue North Wisconsin Rapids Wisconsin 54495 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED PAPERS, INC. 231 1st Avenue North Wisconsin Rapids, Wisconsin 54495 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reitter, Thomas W. 8131 Evergreen Avenue Wisconsin Rapids, Wisconsin 54494 / US | 02 /
Schoenborn, Gary A. 3421 3rd Street South Wisconsin Rapids, Wisconsin 54495 / US | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118016.1 | 17.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | US19960732684 | 18.10.1996 Original published format: US 732684 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0837323 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0837323 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/89, H04N7/18, G07C3/14 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
B65H26/025 (EP);
G01N21/8903 (EP);
G01N2021/8917 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | G01N21/89 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [1999/34] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Videoüberwachung einer schnell bewegten Bahn | [1998/17] | English: | Method of and system for video surveillance of a fast moving web | [1998/17] | French: | Procédé et système de surveillance vidéo d'une bande en mouvement rapide | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5239376 (DITTMANN RANDALL L ET AL) [DA] 1-3,14 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]WO9627825 (CHAMPION INT CORP) [A] 1,7,14 * page 3 - page 8 *; | [A]US5410396 (ROCHESTER JAMES R) [A] 5,7 * column 9, line 41 - line 53 * |