EP0842627 - Mixing, kneeding or cutting tool for a kitchen appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Kronberg / DE | [1999/50] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenz, Marga Friedberger Landstrasse 116 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Kamprath, Karl-Heinz Annemarie-Gossmann-Strasse 90 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
Oppermann, Günter Kirchbornstrasse 17 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [1998/21] | Application number, filing date | 97118030.2 | 17.10.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | DE1996146329 | 09.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19646329 | [1998/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0842627 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0842627 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
A47J43/0722 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1999/05] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rühr-, Knet- und/oder Schneidwerkzeug für ein Küchengerät | [1998/21] | English: | Mixing, kneeding or cutting tool for a kitchen appliance | [1998/21] | French: | Outil à mélanger, pétrir ou couper pour un appareil de cuisine | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.05.2001 | NL | 09.05.2001 | AT | 17.10.2001 | BE | 31.10.2001 | CH | 31.10.2001 | LI | 31.10.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/31] | GB | 09.05.2001 | |
NL | 09.05.2001 | ||
AT | 17.10.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 09.05.2001 | |
NL | 09.05.2001 | ||
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 09.05.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 09.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1846027 (EATON JOSEPH C, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,18 * page 2, line 1 - line 15; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB1079985 (STEPHAN & SOEHNE) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 14 - line 38 * * page 1, line 72 - line 86; figure 2 *; | [YA]DE3144438 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,18 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,8-10; | [A]EP0191119 (STEPHAN & SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 12, paragraph 2; figures 1,11-14 *; | [A]DE4037122 (KRUPS FA ROBERT [DE]) [A] 16,17* abstract * |