EP0840300 - Optical disc system having improved circuitry for performing blank sector check on readable disc and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2355 Main Street Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crupper, Randolph Scott 308 High Street, PO Box 731 Palmer Lake, Colorado 80133 / US | 02 /
Davis, Marvin Benjamin 2813 Palmer Park Blvd. Colorado Springs, Colorado 80909 / US | 03 /
Getreuer, Kurt Walter 115 Golden Hills Rd. Colorado Springs, Colorado 80919 / US | 04 /
Grassens, Leonardus Johannes 19115 Pebble Beach Way Monument, Colorado 80132 / US | 05 /
Lewis, David Earl 14820 Spiritwood Loop Black Forest, Colorado 80106 / US | 06 /
Schell, David Louis 5307 Borrego Drive Colorado Springs, Colorado 80918 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 97118095.5 | 18.01.1996 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19950376882 | 25.01.1995 Original published format: US 376882 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840300 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840300 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B11/10 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
G11B17/043 (EP,US);
G11B7/08 (KR);
G11B11/10504 (EP,US);
G11B11/10534 (EP,US);
G11B11/1055 (EP,US);
G11B11/10563 (EP,US);
G11B11/10576 (EP,US);
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B17/0438 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B21/10 (EP,US);
G11B21/106 (EP,US);
G11B5/5526 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (EP,US);
G11B7/08511 (EP,US);
G11B7/08529 (EP,US);
G11B7/08582 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/0917 (EP,US);
G11B7/093 (EP,US);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US);
G11B7/0933 (EP,US);
G11B7/0935 (EP,US);
G11B7/0941 (EP,US);
G11B7/0943 (EP,US);
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B7/1356 (EP,US);
H02K41/0354 (EP,US);
G11B20/10037 (EP,US);
G11B20/10222 (EP,US);
G11B20/1258 (EP,US);
G11B20/14 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0919 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1281 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1484 (EP,US);
G11B7/00456 (EP,US);
G11B7/00745 (EP,US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US);
H02K41/0356 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/19] | G11B7/09, G11B19/04, G11B11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | Optisches Plattensystem mit verbessertem Schaltungskreis zur Leersektorkontrolle auf einer auslesbaren Platte, und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [1998/19] | English: | Optical disc system having improved circuitry for performing blank sector check on readable disc and method for operating same | [1998/19] | French: | Système de disque optique avec circuits améliorés pour vérifier des secteurs vièrges sur un disque à lecture et méthode de mise en oeuvre | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 08.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96300350.4 / EP0726564 | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.1998 | 31.01.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0162702 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 15-18 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,4,6,10,12,13; | [A]EP0304932 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]US5220543 (KURODA JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0554125 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0586185 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 20-27 * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 30 * * column 6 - column 7 *; | [X]EP0618569 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 20-27 * the whole document *; | [A] - MARCHANT, ALAN B, Optical Recording: A Technical Overview, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, ADDISON-WESLEY, (1990), 19056, XP002093189 [A] * "The servo loop"; page 181 - page 188 * |