EP0837442 - Color plasma display panel and method of driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Pioneer Plasma Display Corporation 2080, Ohnohara-cho Izumi, Kagoshima Prefecture / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states NEC Plasma Display Corporation 2080, Ohnohara-cho Izumi, Kagoshima Prefecture 899-0294 / JP | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Mitsuyoshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshioka, Toshihiro NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118201.9 | 20.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | JP19960278197 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27819796 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837442 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
G09G3/296 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasma-Farbanzeigevorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [1998/17] | English: | Color plasma display panel and method of driving the same | [1998/17] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à plasma en couleurs et son procédé de commande | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0284480 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - line 43 * * column 3, line 17 - line 32 * * column 5, line 25 - line 29 * * column 5, line 45 - line 47; figures 1-4 * [A] 10-12; | [A]EP0135382 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9,13 * column A * * page 1, line 4 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2726390 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 7 * * page 5, line 3 - line 31; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2656716 (THOMSON TUBES ELECTRONIQUES [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 18 * |