EP0838733 - Toner cartridge, image formation apparatus comprising toner cartridge and method of recycling the toner cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Yoshihide c/o Ricoh Co.,Ltd., 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143 / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Hideo c/o Ricoh Co.,Ltd., 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143 / JP | 03 /
Kanda, Shigemi c/o Ricoh Co.,Ltd., 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143 / JP | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118369.4 | 22.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | JP19960279045 | 22.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27904596 | JP19970043803 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4380397 | JP19970286386 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28638697 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838733 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838733 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838733 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
G03G15/0896 (EP,US);
G03G15/0867 (KR);
G03G15/0894 (EP,US);
G03G21/105 (KR);
B65D83/06 (KR);
G03G2215/00987 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/08] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tonerkartusche, Bilderzeugungsgerät mit Tonerkartusche und Verfahren zur Wiederverwendung der Tonerkartusche | [1998/18] | English: | Toner cartridge, image formation apparatus comprising toner cartridge and method of recycling the toner cartridge | [1998/18] | French: | Cartouche de toner, appareil de formation d'images avec la cartouche de toner et procédé pour recycler la cartouche de toner | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH0862956 ; | [E]US5682584 (HATTORI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [E] 1-3,27-29,55,56 * column W *; | [YA]JPH06194941 ; | [A]JPH0425877 ; | [A]JPH04372966 ; | [A]US5185616 (WILCKE GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PX]JPH09222783 ; | [A]US5381217 (ISHIDA TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 39 - column 10, line 30; figures 6,8,9 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, & JP08062956 A 19960308 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,27-29,55,56 * abstract * [A] 32,33 [Y] 4-7,12,15-17,23,30,31 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941018), vol. 018, no. 546, Database accession no. (P - 1814), & JP06194941 A 19940715 (CANON INC) [Y] 4-7,12,15-17,23,30,31 * abstract * [A] 19-22,24-26 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920511), vol. 016, no. 193, Database accession no. (P - 1349), & JP04025877 A 19920129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 3,8,9,15-18,39 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930520), vol. 017, no. 255, Database accession no. (P - 1539), & JP04372966 A 19921225 (CANON INC) [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, & JP09222783 A 19970826 (CANON INC) [PX] 1-3 * abstract * |