EP0838820 - Information reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matoba, Hiroshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118558.2 | 24.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | JP19960283978 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: JP 28397896 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838820 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838820 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/28, H04N5/765, G11B27/11, H04N7/087, H04N7/088, H04N5/93 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
G11B27/3054 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/107 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
H04N5/9206 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/18] | G11B27/10, G11B27/28, H04N5/765 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/38] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationswiedergabegerät | [1998/18] | English: | Information reproducing apparatus | [1998/18] | French: | Appareil de reproduction d'information | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/24] | Appeal following examination | 21.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T0731/08 | 28.02.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.04.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2011 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9207360 (MORO MARIO [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,9,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,6,8,10,14,15; | [X]US5353121 (YOUNG PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,9 * column 11, line 26 - column 13, line 3 *; | [A]WO9416441 (YUEN HENRY C [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 14, line 1 - page 23, line 3 * * page 58, line 8 - page 63, line 32 *; | [A]EP0692790 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0581601 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0646366 ; | [A]EP0608960 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 12 *; | [A]US4677466 (LERT JR JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [E]US5818441 (THROCKMORTON JOHN A [US], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940525), vol. 018, no. 275, Database accession no. (E - 1553), & JP06046366 A 19940218 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |