EP0841459 - Overhead storage cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWORTH, INC. One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40 Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states HAWORTH, INC. One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40 Holland Michigan 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fricano, Nicholas J. 1210 Oakes Avenue Grand Haven, MI 49417 / IT | 02 /
Lang, Scott A. 3244 Rollingview Court Hudsonville, MI 49426 / IT | 03 /
Haworth, Richard G. 4622 66th Street Holland, MI 49423 / IT | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118654.9 | 27.10.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | US19960744265 | 06.11.1996 Original published format: US 744265 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0841459 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0841459 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841459 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/11, A47B96/00, E06B3/40 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
E06B5/006 (EP,US);
A47B47/00 (EP,US);
E06B3/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/20] | E06B9/11, A47B96/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/23] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzuhängender Lagerschrank | [2003/05] | English: | Overhead storage cabinet | [1998/20] | French: | Placard haut, suspendu | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/20] | Aufgehängter Lagerschrank | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 07.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH367152 (HABERFELD ERWIN O [CH]) [A] 1,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5339852 (BULL DANNY C [US]) [A] 1,8,9,15,17,20 * column W *; | [A]US5172969 (REUTER ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]GB2210859 (CHO PLA INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | US1115345 | US2301856 | US2551305 | US2590028 | US4167298 | US4371223 | US5050944 | US5172969 | US5409308 |