EP0840534 - Electric heating and control thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERÄTEBAU GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehlmann, Ralf Oberdorfstrasse 57 75015 Bretten-Gölshausen / DE | 02 /
Block, Volker Kopernikusweg 14 75015 Bretten / DE | 03 /
Bierbaum, Achim Karl-May-Strasse 9 74078 Heilbronn / DE | 04 /
Schilling, Wilfried Karlsruher Strasse 16 76703 Kraichtal / DE | 05 /
Ose, Lutz, Dr. Breiter Weg 4 75447 Sternenfels / DE | 06 /
Bogdanski, Franz, Dr. Kirchberg 28 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118676.2 | 28.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | DE1996145095 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19645095 | [1998/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840534 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B1/02, H05B3/26, H05B3/06, A47J27/21 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
H05B1/02 (EP);
H05B1/0208 (EP);
H05B3/00 (EP);
H05B3/06 (EP);
H05B3/26 (EP);
H05B2203/011 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrische Heizung und Steuerung | [1998/19] | English: | Electric heating and control thereof | [1998/19] | French: | Chauffage électrique et sa commande | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4841170 (ECCLESTON LARRY E) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * column 4 - column 5; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5,10; | [X]GB2283156 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * abstract *; | [X]US4374316 (INAMORI KAZUO ET AL) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract *; | [X]GB1187595 (TELEFUNKEN) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2354719 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [Y]GB2228634 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD) [Y] 5,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5437002 (BENNETT STEVEN B) [A] 5,10 * column 5, line 47 - column 6; figures 1,3 * |