EP0825712 - Electronically tuned matching networks using adjustable inductance elements and resonant tank circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Kenneth S. 165 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | 02 /
Trow, John 162 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | 03 /
Roderick, Craig A. 776 Pineview Drive San Jose, California 95111 / US | 04 /
Pinson II, Jay Dee 6879 Queenswood Way San Jose, California 95120 / US | 05 /
Buchberger II, Douglas A. 421 Czerny Street Tracy, California 95376 / US | 06 /
Hartlage, Robert Paul 2645 Bonnie Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 07 /
Shel, Viktor 505 Bayview Park Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [1998/22] |
Former [1998/17] | 01 /
Collins, Kenneth S. 165 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | ||
02 /
Trow, John 162 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | |||
03 /
Roderick, Craig A. 776 Pineview Drive San Jose, California 95111 / US | |||
04 /
Pinson II, Jay Dee 6879 Queenswood Way San Jose, California 95120 / US | |||
05 /
Buchberger II, Douglas A. 1032 Hickory Street Tracy, California 95376 / US | |||
06 /
Hartlage, Robert Paul 2645 Bonnie Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
07 /
Shel, Viktor 505 Bayview Park Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
Former [1998/09] | 01 /
Collins, Kenneth S. 165 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | ||
02 /
Trow, John 162 Knightshaven Way San Jose, California 95111 / US | |||
03 /
Roderick, Craig A. 776 Pineview Drive San Jose, California 95111 / US | |||
04 /
Pinson II, Jay Dee 6879 Queenswood Way San Jose, California 95120 / US | |||
05 /
Buchberger II, Douglas A. 1032 Hickory Street Tracy, California 95376 / US | |||
06 /
Hartlage, Robert Paul 1111 Morse Avenue, Apt. 24 Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | |||
07 /
Shel, Viktor 505 Bayview Park Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118731.5 | 12.11.1993 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | US19920975355 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: US 975355 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825712 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825712 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/40, H01J37/32 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
H01J37/32183 (EP,US);
H03H11/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01F29/146 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32082 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01J37/32146 (EP,US);
H01J37/32165 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32458 (EP,US);
H01J37/32522 (EP,US);
H01J37/32688 (EP,US);
H01J37/32706 (EP,US);
H01J37/32871 (EP,US);
H01L21/31116 (EP,KR,US);
H03H7/40 (EP,KR,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,KR,US);
H01F2029/143 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | H03H7/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/09] | Title | German: | Elektronisch abgestimmte Anpassungsschaltung mit veränderlichen Induktivitäten und Schwingkreisen | [1998/09] | English: | Electronically tuned matching networks using adjustable inductance elements and resonant tank circuits | [1998/09] | French: | Circuit d'adaptation d'accord électronique utilisant des éléments d'inductance ajustables et circuits oscillants | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 12.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/12] | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93118387.5 / EP0597497 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0334297 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0489407 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5-9 * page 5, line 39 - page 8, column 26; figure 1 * * page 9, line 49 - page 12, line 16; figure 5 * |