EP0839683 - Power output apparatus, engine controller, and methods of controlling power output apparatus and engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Katsuhiko c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 02 /
Yamaoka, Masaaki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 03 /
Kotani, Takeshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Shoichi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 05 /
Takaoka, Toshifumi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 06 /
Kanai, Hiroshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118748.9 | 28.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | JP19960303950 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: JP 30395096 | JP19970070800 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7080097 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0839683 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0839683 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839683 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/00, B60K6/04 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B60W20/40 (EP);
B60K6/20 (KR);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/38 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/42 (KR);
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60L15/025 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/40 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
F02D29/02 (KR);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60L2220/12 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
B60L2220/18 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2260/42 (EP,US);
B60L2270/145 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0011 (EP);
B60W2050/0012 (EP);
B60W2510/0652 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0616 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0661 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
B60W2710/105 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung, Motorsteuerung und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Antriebsanordnung und des Motors | [1998/19] | English: | Power output apparatus, engine controller, and methods of controlling power output apparatus and engine | [1998/19] | French: | nystème d'entraînement, commande de moteur et méthode pour contrôler le système d'entraînement et le moteur | [2001/49] |
Former [1998/19] | Système d'entrainement, commande de moteur et méthode pour contrôler le système d'entraînement et le moteur | Examination procedure | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01112400.5 / EP1122112 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4407132 (KAWAKATSU SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,19,20 * column 13, line 57 - column 14, line 37; figure 12B *; | [A]EP0725474 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,11,19,20 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 19; claims 1,18 *; | [PA]JPH08295140 (AQUEOUS RES KK) [PA] 1,11,19,20 * figures 2,7-9 *; | [PA]EP0743211 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,11,19,20 * figures 9,14; claims 2,4,7,10,12,14 *; | [PA]EP0743216 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,11,19,20 * column 43, line 26 - line 35; claims 14,15 *; | [PA]DE19532128 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1,11,19,20 * figures 7,8; claims 1,4,25 *; | [T]EP0830969 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [T] 1,11,19,20 * page 11, line 49 - line 51 ** page 12, line 44 - line 51; claims 10,11 *; | [T]US5788006 (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP]) [T] * claims 2,3 * | by applicant | JPS5030223 |