EP0844178 - Packaging machine, especially for making cigarette packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Gosebruch, Harald, Dr. Bürgermeister-Urban-Strasse 11 27283 Verden / DE | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR, Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119514.4 | 07.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE19961048221 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648221 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844178 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844178 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0844178 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/02 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B65B19/02 (EP);
B65B65/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaschine, insbesondere zum Herstellen von Zigarettenpackungen | [1998/22] | English: | Packaging machine, especially for making cigarette packages | [1998/22] | French: | Machine d'emballage, spécialement pour fabriquer des emballages pour cigarettes | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 30.11.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 03.12.2001 | Observations by third parties | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE G.D Società per Azioni Via Battindarno 91 40133 Bologna / IT Opponent's representative Maccagnan, Matteo Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE G.D Società per Azioni Via Battindarno 91 40133 Bologna / IT Opponent's representative Maccagnan, Matteo, Dr. Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | 10.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.06.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 15.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.03.2004 | FR | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
FR | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
FR | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/05] | NL | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0294251 (REMY & CIE E P [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 6 - paragraph 7 *; | [A]EP0619231 (SASIB SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4569180 (RUSSO LUIGI [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 11 - line 40 * | by applicant | EP0294251 | US5347791 | DE2852890 | EP0844178 | other | US5347791 | US4807420 | DE2852890 | US4976598 | DE3919704 | Opposition | DE3919704 | US4976598 | US5347791 | US4807420 | DE2852890 |