EP0831487 - Optical disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Soju No. 201 Dai 2 Kobayashiso, 6-8-1 Minamidaira Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/13] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119660.5 | 29.10.1993 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | JP19920316444 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: JP 31644492 | JP19920316445 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: JP 31644592 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0831487 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0831487 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831487 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/036, G11B27/32, G11B27/34, G11B19/12, G11B33/10, G11B27/11, G11B27/10 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B33/10 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/13] | G11B27/32, G11B27/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/13] | Title | German: | Abspielgerät für optische Platten | [1998/13] | English: | Optical disc player | [1998/13] | French: | Lecteur de disque optique | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 11.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93117623.4 / EP0595358 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02139782 ; | [A]JPH02187979 ; | [A]JPS63255889 ; | [PA]JPH04341990 ; | [A]EP0346979 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0399853 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * figure 2; claims 1-3,6-15 *; | [A]EP0406021 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5124963 (ANDO RYO [JP]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 4, line 44 - column 8, line 44; figure 8 *; | [PA]EP0535732 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900814), vol. 14, no. 376, Database accession no. (P - 1092), & JP02139782 A 19900529 (SHARP CORP.) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901015), vol. 14, no. 472, Database accession no. (P - 1116), & JP02187979 A 19900724 (SHARP CORP.) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890217), vol. 13, no. 70, Database accession no. (P - 829), & JP63255889 A 19881024 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930415), vol. 17, no. 194, Database accession no. (P - 1522), & JP04341990 A 19921127 (SONY CORP.) [PA] 1 * abstract * |