EP0846463 - Active substance containing plaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [1998/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Himmelsbach, Peter Rübker Strasse 16a 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 02 /
Linder, Helmut, Dr. Graf-Anton-Weg 53f 22459 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Broschk, Katharina Eppendorfer Weg 200 20253 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
Sinnen, Marike Feldstrasse 62 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 05 /
Wasner, Matthias Rothenhauschaussee 75 21029 Hamburg / DE | [1998/24] | Application number, filing date | 97119880.9 | 13.11.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | DE1996150471 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19650471 | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846463 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846463 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846463 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61L15/58 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
A61K36/81 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61K9/7076 (EP,US);
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/81, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61L15/58, C08L53/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/50] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wirkstoffhaltige Pflaster | [1998/24] | English: | Active substance containing plaster | [1998/24] | French: | Pansement adhésif contenant un médicament | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Request for further processing for: | 05.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0305756 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,11 * abstract * * column 6, line 9 - line 20 *; | [DX]DE4224325 (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-3,7-9,12-15 * page 3, line 29 - line 45 *; | [A]US5306503 (MUELLER WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,14 * column 5, line 15 - line 25 * * example 4 ** claims 1,14-16 * |