EP0856972 - Network photograph service system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2006/07] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiota, Kazuo, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 2-26-30, Nishiazabu, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Nobuyoshi Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 258 / JP | 03 /
Ohtsuka, Shuichi Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 258 / JP | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119896.5 | 13.11.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | JP19960306273 | 18.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30627396 | JP19970255037 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25503797 | JP19970266569 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26656997 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856972 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856972 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856972 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/30 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/53 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/5683 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N1/00132 (EP,US);
H04N1/00135 (EP,US);
H04N1/00137 (EP,US);
H04N1/00145 (EP,US);
H04N1/00148 (EP,US);
H04N1/00151 (EP,US);
H04N1/00164 (EP,US);
H04N1/00188 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00962 (EP,US);
H04N1/2361 (EP,US);
H04N1/32529 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0039 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/11] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netz-Photographischesdienstsystem | [1998/32] | English: | Network photograph service system | [1998/32] | French: | Système de reseau de service photographique | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 08.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04004736.7 / EP1422647 | EP05023402.0 / EP1632896 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5327265 (MCDONALD BRUCE A [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 19 - line 52 * * Abstract;; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9505050 (TECHNOLOGY INC B V [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 9 - line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0649121 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,6 * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 27 * * figure 1; claim 14 * [A] 5; | [YA]GB2286944 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1,6 * page 3, line 27 - line 33 * * page 7, line 30 - line 34 * * page 10, line 7 - line 15 * * Abstract * [A] 2,3,7,8; | [E]EP0878956 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-4,6-8 * page 3, line 7 - line 19 ** page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 10 * |