EP0843504 - Organic electroluminescent device driving method, organic electroluminescent apparatus and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Hiroyuki 1-1-18, Honmachi Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119924.5 | 13.11.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | JP19960304886 | 15.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30488696 | JP19970275454 | 08.10.1997 Original published format: JP 27545497 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843504 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843504 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843504 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/02, H05B33/12, H05B33/00, G09G3/30 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
G09G3/2018 (EP,US);
G09G3/3258 (EP,US);
H05B33/02 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
H10K85/30 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/21] | H05B33/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/32] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Organisches elektrolumineszentes Bauteil-Steuerungsverfahren, organisches elektrolumineszentes Gerät und Anzeigevorrichtung | [1998/21] | English: | Organic electroluminescent device driving method, organic electroluminescent apparatus and display device | [1998/21] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un dispositif organique électroluminescent, appareil organique électroluminescent et dispositif d'affichage | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JPH0982472 ; | [A]EP0365445 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 7,10,14,15,19,20* the whole document *; | [A]WO9626830 (UNIV OHIO STATE [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-46 *; | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09082472 A 19970328 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [AP] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - YOSHIDA M ET AL, "THREE-LAYERED MULTICOLOR ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19960805), vol. 69, no. 6, pages 734 - 736, XP000626082 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.117874 |