EP0849375 - Liquid feed vaporization system and gas injection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horie, Kuniaki Sanpia Odakyusakuragaoka 404, 1-15-2 Daikan, Yamoto-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hidenao 1-4-28 Watauchi Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakada, Tsutomu 150-4-3-207 Hitorisawa, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kuriyama, Fumio No. 201, 2833-43 Totsuka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Murakami, Takeshi 3-9-8-302 Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Abe, Masahito 1-9-2 Inari, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Araki, Yuji 1-9-2 Inari, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Ueyama, Hiroyuki 1-9-2 Inari, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120370.8 | 20.11.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960324637 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: JP 32463796 | JP19970102810 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10281097 | JP19970184485 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: JP 18448597 | JP19970289133 | 06.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28913397 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849375 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849375 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849375 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, B01D1/00 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C23C16/448 (EP,US);
C23C16/45561 (EP,US);
C23C16/45565 (EP,US);
C23C16/4557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/32] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verdampfen von Flüssigkeiten und Gaseinspritzeinrichtung | [1998/26] | English: | Liquid feed vaporization system and gas injection device | [1998/26] | French: | Vaporisateur pour matériaux liquides et appareil d'injection de gaz | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0635460 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 4 * page 6, column 23 - column 54; figures 5,6 * [A] 1,5-7; | [X]FR2692597 (MIKROKEMIA OY [FI]) [X] 4 * figure 2; claims 10-14 *; | [X]JPH02145768 ; | [A]EP0303911 (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]DE4107756 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 21-23 * figures 2A,2B; claims 7,8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900823), vol. 014, no. 390, Database accession no. (C - 0751), & JP02145768 A 19900605 (KOUJIYUNDO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 10,11 * abstract * |