EP0844580 - Guide displaying device and method for use in a video game system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/22] | Video game system and storage medium for storing program for use in the video game system | ||
[2007/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Toru Dandelion Nishinomiya 3-403, 2-12, Somedonocho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Katakami, Fumimasa Yuko 2-bankan 406, 39-17 Mizudocho 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Okuda, Yasuo Domil Sata 802, 9-16, Satanakamachi 3-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Nakagawa, Eiji Kakogawa Young Palace 201, 115-7, Mizonokuchi Kakogawacho, Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Kuri, Koji Cosmo Plaza Sannomiya 423, Gokodori 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120468.0 | 21.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | JP19960311123 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31112396 | JP19960311124 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31112496 | JP19960311125 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31112596 | JP19960311126 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31112696 | JP19960311127 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31112796 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844580 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844580 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844580 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A63F9/02 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
A63F13/48 (EP,KR);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
A63F13/5372 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/42 (US);
A63F13/493 (EP,KR);
A63F13/497 (EP,KR);
A63F13/5255 (EP,KR);
A63F13/5375 (KR,US);
A63F13/812 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/828 (EP,KR);
A63F13/843 (EP,KR);
A63F13/422 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/303 (US);
A63F2300/306 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/307 (US);
A63F2300/6054 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/634 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/636 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/64 (US);
A63F2300/6676 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/8011 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | G06F19/00, A63F9/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/31] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für die Anzeige einer Führung in einem Videospielsystem | [2007/01] | English: | Guide displaying device and method for use in a video game system | [2007/01] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'un guide et méthode pour son utilisation dans un système de jeu vidéo | [2007/06] |
Former [1998/22] | Videospielsystem und Programmspeicher für ein Videospielsystem | ||
Former [1998/22] | Video game system and storage medium for storing program for use in the video game system | ||
Former [1998/22] | Système de jeu vidéo et mémoire de programme pour un système de jeu vidéo | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 26.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.04.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 18.06.2003 | Appeal received No. T0928/03 | 30.07.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.06.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 02.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP06011385.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 04.07.2006 | EP06013875.7 / EP1703429 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4249734 (BROMLEY ERIC [US]) [A] 5-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - column 3, line 68 *; | [A]US4342454 (BAER RALPH H, et al) [A] 16-24 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 15 *; | [YA]US4918603 (HUGHES PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 25-30 * column 2, line 18 - column 16, line 2; figures 1-11 * [A] 1-4; | [A]US5067079 (SMITH III JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-4,25-30 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 11 * * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 38; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]WO9416426 (THRUSTMASTER INC [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, line 4 - page 6, line 7 * * page 20, line 25 - page 29, line 5; figures 2-11 * [A] 25-30; | [A]US5342054 (CHANG PHILIP L [US], et al) [A] 16-24 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 55 *; | [Y]GB2283302 (NAMCO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8,9,14,15 * page 16, line 23 - line 26; figure 2 *; | [A]US5435554 (LIPSON PETER [US]) [A] 1-4,25-30 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y]US5462275 (LOWE DANNY D [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,25-30 * column 1, line 28 - column 16, line 67; figures 1-9 *; | [XA]EP0686944 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 31,32,36 * column 5, line 47 - column 9, line 46; figures 6-12 * [A] 33-35,37-39; | [A]EP0700010 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [A] 5-15 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 33 *; | [XY]EP0715869 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [X] 5-7,10-13,16-24 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 57 - column 20, line 17; figures 1-18 * [Y] 8,9,14,15; | [A]WO9622581 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al) [A] 5-15; | [A]WO9634364 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al) [A] 31-39; | EP0758117 [ ] (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 14 - column 8, line 44 *; | EP0773515 [ ] (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [ ] * column 28, line 30 - column 30, line 12; figures 21,23 * |