EP0844541 - Apparatus management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIKOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 2-5, Marunouchi Takamatsu-shi Kagawa-ken 760 / JP | [2004/15] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states SHIKOKU RESEARCH INSTITUTE INCORPORATED 2109-8, Yashimanishimachi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIKOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 2-5, Marunouchi Takamatsu-shi Kagawa-ken 760 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Yoshikazu 1528, Yashima-Nishimachi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa-ken / JP | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120742.8 | 26.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | JP19960314334 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31433496 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844541 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844541 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844541 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/30] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Geräteverwaltungssystem | [1998/22] | English: | Apparatus management system | [1998/22] | French: | Système de gestion d'appareil | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.01.2005
16.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | [2005/10] | 23.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.06.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.06.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/49] | 22.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5490134 (FERNANDES ROOSEVELT A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 2A-4 * * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 36 * * column 5, line 49 - column 9, line 43 * * column 15, line 28 - column 16, line 35 *; | [A] - HILDING ELMQVIST, "A UNIFORM ARCHITECTURE FOR DISTRIBUTED AUTOMATION", ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL, (19910101), vol. 46, no. PART 02, ISSN 1054-0032, pages 1599 - 1608, XP000347589 [A] 1-9 * page 1600, paragraph 3 - page 1606, paragraph 1 * * page 1617, paragraph 5 - page 1618, paragraph 5 * * figure - * | [A] - TOOLE P, "DISTRIBUTED SCADA: FROM THE PLANT FLOOR TO THE EXECUTIVE SUITE", I & CS - INDUSTRIAL AND PROCESS CONTROL MAGAZINE, (19960101), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0746-2395, pages 67 - 70, XP000581194 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - DREWS H ET AL, "LEITTECHNISCHES KONZEPT FUER ZEMENTWERKE", ELEKTRIE, (19930101), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0013-5399, pages 47 - 51, XP000363798 [A] 1-9 * page 47 - page 49 * * figure - * |