EP0845899 - Video display apparatus having phase-locked loop used for synchronizing a horizontal scan frequency with a synchronizing input signal frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozawa, Shinji, c/o NEC IC Microcomp. Syst., Ltd. 403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120849.1 | 27.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | JP19960317594 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31759496 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0845899 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0845899 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845899 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/12 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
H04N5/126 (EP,US);
H04N5/455 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/37] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Videowiedergabegerät mit Phasenregelschleife zur Synchronisierung der horizontaler Abtastfrequenz mit der Synchroneingangssignalfrequenz | [1998/23] | English: | Video display apparatus having phase-locked loop used for synchronizing a horizontal scan frequency with a synchronizing input signal frequency | [1998/23] | French: | Appareil d'affichage vidéo avec boucle verrouillée en phase utilisée pour la synchronisation d'une fréquence de balayage horizontal avec la fréquence d'un signal d'entrée de synchronisation | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4634939 (DIETZ WOLFGANG F W [US]); | [A]US4660080 (DIETZ WOLFGANG F W [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |